MA H3498 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a donation check-off box on state tax returns for the establishment of the Y.M.C.A Youth and Government fund. Revenue.
Title
Providing for a donation check-off box on state tax returns for the Massachusetts Youth in Government program
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] |
Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H617 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H617 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3498 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3498.pdf |