MA H617 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the long-term management and maintenance of certain harbor islands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve to establish a special commission to perform an investigation and providing for a study relative to the long term management, maintenance and future use of the Boston Harbor Long and Moon Islands
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] |
Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2015-07-27 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2015-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1157 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1157 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H617 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H617.pdf |