MA H3487 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Haverhill to appoint Scott Bradish a firefighter in said city notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the appointment of Scott Bradish as a firefighter in the city of Haverhill notwithstanding the maximum age requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-07 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3487 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3487.pdf |