MA H3483 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4966
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting veterans from the standard registration fee for veterans license plates. Transportation.
Title
Exempting veterans from the standard registration fee for veterans license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4966 |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3584 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H3586 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2319 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2332 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3586 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2319 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2332 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3483 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3483.pdf |