MA H3478 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4611
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protecting the health and safety of employees engaged in trenching, excavating and working in confined spaces. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring municipalities to follow Occupational Safety and Health Act (OSHA) regulations and standards with regard to: trenching and excavation; and confined space work
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4611 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4611 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1930 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3527 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H3410 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H3392 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
H3411 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Accompanied H3412
H1930 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3527 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H3410 (Similar To) 2016-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4668
H3392 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
H3411 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Accompanied H3412
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3478 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3478.pdf |