MA H3467 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to notification of fluoridated water in public water supplies. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Requiring a fluoride statement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4417 |
2013-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4417 (Replaced by) 2014-08-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3467 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3467.pdf |