MA H3459 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prevailing wages in the city of Holyoke. Labor and Workforce Development. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the prevailing wage in the city of Holyoke
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H4036 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2017
H4652 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4036 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2017
H4652 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3459 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3459.pdf |