MA H3458 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the Department of Transportation to post signs in highway rest stops and MBTA stations and vehicles alerting the public to the National Human Trafficking Hotline. Transportation.
Title
Relative to human trafficking awareness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Accompanied S2226 |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2226 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S1063 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S1063 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3458.pdf |