MA H3448 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4966
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensing requirements for school bus drivers. Transportation.
Title
Relative to school bus safety
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4966 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2334 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3491 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4478
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2311 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
H3491 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4478
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2311 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3448 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3448.pdf |