MA H3448 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to grant an additional license for the sale wines and malt beverages in the city of Fitchburg. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Fitchburg to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-10-16 | House | Enacted |
2013-10-15 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2013-10-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-09-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-07-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 03:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3448 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3448.pdf |