MA H3443 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the audit performance and functions at the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding audit performance and functions at the Department of Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-01HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2023-10-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-03-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2414 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2023
S2556 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2808 (Similar To) 2024-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback