MA H3439 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the collection of all-electronic tolling data. Transportation.
Title
Relative to all-electronic tolling data privacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1936 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H3641 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
S1959 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S1987 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H3436 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H3641 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
S1959 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S1987 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H3436 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3439 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3439.pdf |