MA H3641 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electronic tolling on certain state and interstate highways. Transportation.
Title
Relative to electronic tolling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4597 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 10:00AM-12:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H807 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H809 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S961 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1863 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1841 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3782
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3963 (Similar To) 2017-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2017
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H809 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S961 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1863 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1841 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3782
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3963 (Similar To) 2017-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2017
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3641 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3641.pdf |