MA H3424 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contract assistance for central artery debt of the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. Transportation.
Title
Relative to contract assistance for central artery debt of the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4597 |
2017-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1873 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1876 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1833 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2675 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1901 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1876 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1833 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2675 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1901 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3424 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3424.pdf |