MA H3416 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee the House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee the House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kulik of Worthington, a petition of Stephen Kulik that the Commissioner of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to release certain land in the town of Cummington from the operation of an agricultural preservation restriction. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Authorizing the release of certain land in the town of Cummington from the operation of an agricultural preservation restriction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee the House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2016-01-25 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3416 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3416.pdf |