MA H3408 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the Massachusetts transportation and environment equity fund and the development of a comprehensive transportation and development program for the Commonwealth. Transportation.
Title
Creating the Massachusetts transportation and environment equity fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4597 |
2017-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4597 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3408 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3408.pdf |