MA H3386 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the issuance of secondhand dealers licenses in the city of Revere. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the issuance of secondhand dealers licenses in the city of Revere
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Report accepted |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2014-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-04-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3386 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3386.pdf |