MA H3379 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenace to release certain property interests and easements in Lowell Heritage State Park. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the land acquisition for Hamilton Crossing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #130 [36 yeas - 0 nays] |
2011-11-16 | House | Enacted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 172) |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-16 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-11-15 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3379 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11052&generalCourtId=1 |