MA H3376 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement benefits of the surviving beneficiary of Francis X. Noe. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement benefits of the surviving beneficiary of Francis X. Noe
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3777 |
2015-09-28 | House | Read third |
2015-07-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2015-07-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-05-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4733 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 391 of the Acts of 2016
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1416 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1984 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1848 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3376 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3376.pdf |