MA H3375 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a onetime competitive grant program administered by the Office of Travel and Tourism to provide tourism and visitor marketing funds to businesses and regional tourism councils. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
To recover hospitality, visitor and tourism jobs from Covid-19
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D] |
Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Joan Meschino [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5219 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2242 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2908
H5219 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5219 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3375 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3375.pdf |