MA H3369 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4450
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the operation of autonomous vehicles without active control or monitoring by a human operator. Transportation.
Title
Relative to autonomous vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4450 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2014-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/05/2014 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4450 (Replaced by) 2014-09-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3369 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3369.pdf |