MA H3364 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Janet Maslowski, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Janet Maslowski, an employee of the Franklin/Hampshire Juvenile Court
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-31 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-07-29 | House | Enacted |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-07-29 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-07-27 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2015-07-27 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2015-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second, amended as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-06-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-05-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-05-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2773 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3364 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3364.pdf |