MA H3361 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4408

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to identifying Asian American and Pacific Islander ethnic groups residing in the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring state agencies to collect Asian American aggregate data

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4408
2018-01-24JointHearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S1290 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3092 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2489 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3518 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3068 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H4408 (Replaced by) 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass with amendments and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendments pending

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback