MA H3355 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3711
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lincoln be authorized to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Lincoln to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3711 |
2015-07-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2015-06-16 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3711 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2016
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3355 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3355.pdf |