MA H3353 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for field safety in gas infrastructure by requiring that the Department of Public Utilities promulgate regulations establishing requirements for the maintenance, timely updating, accuracy, and security of gas LDC maps and records. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
For field safety in gas infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3273 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2188 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2234 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3273 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2188 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2234 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3353 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3353.pdf |