MA H3351 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a transit fair voucher program. Transportation.
Title
Relative to a transit fair voucher program
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S989 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H3379 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2293
H2809 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H866 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4294 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Adopted, in concurrence
H3379 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S2293
H2809 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H866 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4294 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3351 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3351.pdf |