MA H3349 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to conservation and natural gas infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to conservation and natural gas infrastructure
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Meschino [D] | Rep. James Murphy [D] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3893 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3279 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H849 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2185 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S348 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S2200 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1337 (Similar To) 2021-12-09 - Accompanied H2135
S2195 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S501 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4790 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Published as amended, see H4807
H2135 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3893 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S527 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3279 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H849 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2185 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S348 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S2200 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1337 (Similar To) 2021-12-09 - Accompanied H2135
S2195 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S501 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4790 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Published as amended, see H4807
H2135 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3349 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3349.pdf |