MA H334 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the registration of veterinarians. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the registration of veterinarians
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-07-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3484 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3529 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2372 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - New draft substituted, see S2797
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S188 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2568
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1381 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied H2266
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1246 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
H3529 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2372 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - New draft substituted, see S2797
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
H3458 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S188 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2568
S435 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1381 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied H2266
S201 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1246 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H334.pdf |