MA H3330 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4216
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to capital investments and job creation in rural areas through a nonrefundable tax credit for certain taxpayers. Revenue.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts rural jobs act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4216 |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1628 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1629 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3858
S1494 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H4216 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1628 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1629 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3858
S1494 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H4216 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3330 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3330.pdf |