MA H3329 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Milton to issue an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises of a certain restaurant
Title
Authorizing the town of Milton to issue an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises of a certain restaurant
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-04-29 | House | Enacted |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-04-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-04-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3329 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3329.pdf |