MA H3327 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H879
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to donations of food to persons in need. Revenue.
Title
Encouraging the donation of food to persons in need
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-02-20 | House | Accompanied by S838 and H879 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-05-08 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2017-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S838 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
S1495 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S848 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2626 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3348 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1199 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H879 (Replaces) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
S1495 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S848 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2626 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3348 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1199 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H879 (Replaces) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3327 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3327.pdf |