MA H3323 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to liquid or gas flammable material spills on public ways. Transportation.
Title
Relative to liquid or gas flammable material spills on public ways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3269 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3472 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H1563 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3304 (Similar To) 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3472 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H1563 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3304 (Similar To) 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3323 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3323.pdf |