MA H3305 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt home appliance service and repair technicians from certain provisions of the Massachusetts Plumbing Code. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to exempting home appliance service and repair technicians from certain provisions of the Massachusetts Plumbing Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4153 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4153 (Replaced by) 2014-12-11 - Reported, in part, by H243
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3305 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3305.pdf |