MA H3303 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of the New Bedford State Pier and the Fall River State Pier for offshore energy exploration or development. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to Fall River offshore wind opportunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2645 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2022
H2646 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2022
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2503 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2022
H4766 (Similar To) 2022-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4870
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5360 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Text of an amendment, see S2503
H2646 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2022
S1358 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2503
S2503 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 260 of the Acts of 2022
H4766 (Similar To) 2022-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4870
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5360 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Text of an amendment, see S2503
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3303 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3303.pdf |