MA H3255 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the eviction of certain tenants. The Judiciary.
Title
Protecting vulnerable tenants from displacement
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Peter Capano [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
Rep. Joan Meschino [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S802 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S1023 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1255 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
H1256 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
S801 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1023 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1255 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
H1256 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
S801 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3255 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3255.pdf |