MA H3247 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5081

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to operating a motor vehicle while under the influence of intoxicating liquor or drugs. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to drug driving

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5081
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1580 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3253 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3477 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3028 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3119 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback