MA H1580 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to operating motor vehicles under the influence of alcohol or controlled substances. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further strengthening public safety through interlock devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2325 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H2275 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2277 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2128 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H2957 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3247 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1513 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1464 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1378 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2137 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3477 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S2040 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1428 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
S2289 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - House concurred
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback