MA H3235 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing access to medical care for veterans by providing use of commuter rail, subway, bus, shuttle and boat services at no cost. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Increasing access to medical care for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1751 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3235 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3235.pdf |