MA H3228 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4600
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include certain municipalities with increased English language learners as gateway communities for education funding. Education.
Title
Relative to education funding for gateway communities
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. John Lawn [D] | Rep. Dennis Rosa [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4600 |
2015-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4600 (Replaced by) 2016-09-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1606 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2830 (Similar To) 2015-11-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2916 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2831 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3228 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3228.pdf |