MA H3223 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4605

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further regulating prescription drug price increases. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote transparency in prescription drug prices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4605
2018-05-29SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-21HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-07-10JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-07-10SenateSenate concurred
2017-07-07HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H331 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S1098 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H4112 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4113 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4605 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback