MA H321 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5043

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the cancellation of gym memberships. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cancellation of gym memberships

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5043
2019-06-28JointHearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H2937 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2784 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2235 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S410 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1551 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2253 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2363 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback