MA H3200 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Velis of Westfield, a petition of John C. Velis for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) of the codes, statutes and criminal laws pertaining to the use of marijuana . Marijuana Policy.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the impact of marijuana legalization on public safety and the well-being of children in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3768 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S714 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2169
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H2597 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S714 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2169
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H2597 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3200.pdf |