MA S714 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission relative to reducing the costs associated with the purchase of college textbooks. Higher Education.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission relative to reducing the costs associated with the purchase of college textbooks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2169 |
2017-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S304 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S699 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2169 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S699 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2169 (Replaced by) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S714 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S714.pdf |