MA H3183 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5256
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5256
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize public corporations to hold remote annual and special meetings. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to permitting public corporations to hold remote annual and special meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5256 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S256 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710
H5256 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5256 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3183 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3183.pdf |