MA H318 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4407
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to training and preparation in the use of augmentative and alternative communication for students. Education.
Title
To improve augmentative and alternative communication opportunities for children with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4407 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4407 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4687
H1685 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4105
H316 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2713 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H74 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1685 (Similar To) 2015-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4105
H316 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2713 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H74 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H318 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H318.pdf |