MA H3174 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to towing rates for commercially registered vehicle not requiring a CDL license. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to equitable towing rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3174 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3174.pdf |