MA H3144 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the scheduling of certain workers in fast food restaurants, retail stores, and hotels that individually or though franchisor or franchisee relationships employ more than seventy-five people. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Establishing just schedules for employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1029 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1010 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2021 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S1026 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S601 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H4 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2093 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
S2104 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
H3816 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Text of an amendment, see H3680
H4640 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2018
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1029 (Similar To) 2017-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1010 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2021 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S1026 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S601 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H4 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2093 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
S2104 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See H3680
H3816 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Text of an amendment, see H3680
H4640 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2018
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3144 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3144.pdf |