MA H3141 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4084
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to leaves of absences for civil air patrol members. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to leaves of absence for civil air patrol members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4084 |
2015-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:30 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4084 (Replaced by) 2016-03-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3141 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3141.pdf |