MA H3136 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4859
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further defining fraud in public construction contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Further defining fraud in public construction contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4859 |
2021-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S727 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4859 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S727 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4859 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3136.pdf |