MA H3126 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of mobile carrying devices operated on sidewalks and crosswalks and intended primarily for transporting personal property. Transportation.
Title
Relative to mobile carrying devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3126 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3126.pdf |